Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1694.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2021
|
Measure version as amended on May 3 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|