Senate | 06/16/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1617.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |