|
08/31/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 158, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2467.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2072.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1722.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1472.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|