Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |