Assembly | 02/01/2022 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2021 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Chau. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1331.) | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |