|
09/22/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1790.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|