|
09/27/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 578, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 17.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 5138.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 3430.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (January 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|