Senate | 08/11/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2022 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3431.) | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |