California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill August 16, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021