|
09/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2333.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1333.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|