|
08/18/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2041.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1692.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A., ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 1710.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|