LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1552
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1552
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1552
Action History
Assembly
05/25/2021
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
04/27/2021
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/11/2021
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Assembly
02/22/2021
Read first time.
Assembly
02/20/2021
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
Assembly
02/19/2021
Introduced. To print.