Senate | 05/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1156.) | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 1. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2021 | Read first time. To print. |