|
03/09/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3681.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2975.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2393.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1834.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|