Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Read first time. To print. |