|
09/22/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2622.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2114.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1071.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|