07/16/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/16/2021 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/08/2021 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/05/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1805.). | ||
Senate | 06/29/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1692.) (June 28). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1340.) | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 18. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Read first time. To print. |