California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 12, 2022

Amended

Bill May 23, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022