LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1596
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1596
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1596
Action History
Assembly
10/24/2022
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
04/20/2022
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/24/2022
Referred to Com. on INS.
Assembly
01/04/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
Assembly
01/03/2022
Read first time. To print.