California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2021

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2021

Amended

Bill July 5, 2021
Bill February 18, 2021