California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill May 23, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022