Assembly | 04/04/2022 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2022 | Read first time. To print. |