|
09/26/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4957.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|