|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 893, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4950.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5028.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|