|
09/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4903.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4910.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|