Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Stricken from file. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | Assembly Member Gallagher withheld unanimous consent on the adoption of committee amendments. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (March 28). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4040.) | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | Read first time. To print. |