California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1645 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 12, 2022

Amended

Bill June 14, 2022
Bill June 2, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022