California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1646 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022