|
09/26/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5100.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|