Senate | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 4403.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2022 | Read first time. To print. |