|
06/24/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4394.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 4827.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 49. Noes 11. Page 4568.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|