Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2022 | Read first time. To print. |