Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Patterson.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4574.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4368.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|