LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1675
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1675
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1675
Action History
Assembly
04/20/2022
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Assembly
04/19/2022
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
03/15/2022
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Assembly
01/27/2022
Referred to Com. on ED.
Assembly
01/21/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
Assembly
01/20/2022
Read first time. To print.