Assembly | 04/25/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | Assembly Rule 47.1 invoked. (Grayson). | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | Read first time. To print. |