Assembly | 10/24/2022 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | Read first time. To print. |