Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 8). | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2022 | Read first time. To print. |