Assembly | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2022 | Introduced. To print. |