Assembly
|
09/13/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4900.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4828.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2022
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|