LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1709
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1709
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1709
Action History
Assembly
03/22/2022
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Assembly
03/14/2022
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Assembly
02/03/2022
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and E.M.
Assembly
01/27/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
Assembly
01/26/2022
Read first time. To print.