Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | (pending re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | Read first time. To print. |