Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | Read first time. To print. |