LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1725
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1725
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1725
Action History
Assembly
03/15/2022
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
03/10/2022
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Assembly
03/09/2022
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
02/03/2022
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B. & P.
Assembly
01/28/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
Assembly
01/27/2022
Read first time. To print.