07/01/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2022. | |||
07/01/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/29/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/20/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4307.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3916.) | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 15). | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Read first time. To print. |