|
07/01/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4264.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3983.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|