|
09/25/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 513, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5200.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
From special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|