Assembly | 04/27/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2022 | Read first time. To print. |