Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4680.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4658.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|