Assembly | 04/26/2022 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2022 | Read first time. To print. |