California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1775 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 17, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022